Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 20:11:14 (UTC).

GUERRERO, LEOBARDO VS AVILA, DYANNA

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 GUERRERO, LEOBARDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AVILA, DYANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCADUTO, LYNN H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3166

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SCADUTO, LYNN H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUERRERO LEOBARDO

Respondent

AVILA DYANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA F

 

Court Documents

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

4/15/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/15/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Re: Attorney's Fees

4/15/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration - Of Lisa F. Rosenthal In Support Of Responsent's Request For Attorney's Fees

4/15/2021: Declaration - Of Lisa F. Rosenthal In Support Of Responsent's Request For Attorney's Fees

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

4/21/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Ex Parte - Application

4/22/2021: Ex Parte - Application

Responsive Declaration

4/22/2021: Responsive Declaration

Minute Order

4/22/2021: Minute Order

Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

4/22/2021: Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/23/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/23/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

3/23/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/23/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/25/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

3/25/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 65 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 65, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support (Re: Attorney's Fees ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Lisa F. Rosenthal In Support Of Responsent's Request For Attorney's Fees ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F