Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 18:38:20 (UTC).

GUERRA, PABLO - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 GUERRA, PABLO - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0397

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANCHEZ JOSEPH RAYMOND

Decedent

GUERRA PABLO

Not Classified By Court

SEFF ZACHARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Final

4/26/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

3/22/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

Letters (Initial)

3/23/2021: Letters (Initial)

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order - Probate

2/2/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order - Probate

Order - Appointing Personal Representative - Limited Authority

2/8/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative - Limited Authority

Declaration - Declaration of Joseph Sanchez in Support of Bond Waiver

1/22/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Joseph Sanchez in Support of Bond Waiver

Supplement - Supplement to Clear Probate Notes (01/25/2021)

1/22/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Clear Probate Notes (01/25/2021)

Minute Order

1/25/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

1/4/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

1/4/2021: Proof of Publication

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial)

12/15/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial)

Miscellaneous Document - Waiver of Bond by Heir

12/15/2020: Miscellaneous Document - Waiver of Bond by Heir

Nomination - Nomination

12/15/2020: Nomination - Nomination

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal - Final ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative (Limited Authority ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Clear Probate Notes (01/25/2021) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Joseph Sanchez in Support of Bond Waiver ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Waiver of Bond by Heir ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial) (Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNomination (Nomination ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE