This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 07:51:29 (UTC).

GUARD-SYSTEMS, INC. VS SAN BERNARDINO MEDICAL GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 GUARD-SYSTEMS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAN BERNARDINO MEDICAL GROUP, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3539

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUARD-SYSTEMS INC.

Defendants

JLL/UNITED HEALTH GROUP

SAN BERNARDINO MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALDERRAMA WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

WESTERFELD BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

1/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Appearance

6/16/2021: Notice of Appearance

Request for Dismissal

7/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by San Bernardino Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guard-Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less