This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 06:17:54 (UTC).

GUANNAN SHI, ET AL. VS PLAZA MEXICO RESIDENCES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 GUANNAN SHI, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PLAZA MEXICO RESIDENCES, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5236

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAO XIOAPING

CHEN JIANCHI

HU CHEN

JING PENG

KUN GUO

SHI GUANNAN

YUAN YUBING

Defendants

CHAE DONALD

CHAE MIN

M&D REGIONAL CENTER LLC

PLAZA MEXICO RESIDENCES II LLC

PLAZA MEXICO RESIDENCES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HSIANG JUSTIN C

CHRISTENSEN ANDREW JOE

TIRRELL CHRISTOPHER T.

Defendant Attorney

KIM EDWARD SANG

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PLAINTIFFS UPDATED IDC STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

5/25/2023: Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PLAINTIFFS UPDATED IDC STATEMENT FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' UNILATERAL ADDITIONAL IDC STATEMENT

5/25/2023: Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' UNILATERAL ADDITIONAL IDC STATEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA CYMERMAN ISO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/16/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA CYMERMAN ISO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/16/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BUFORD JAMES #9296

5/3/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BUFORD JAMES #9296

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

5/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

Case Management Statement

4/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: KERI LOGAN, CSR# 12608

4/19/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: KERI LOGAN, CSR# 12608

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

4/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

4/17/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/13/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: CHRISTINA DOMINGUEZ, CSR# 12516

3/27/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: CHRISTINA DOMINGUEZ, CSR# 12516

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); INF...)

3/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); INF...)

Informal Discovery Conference

3/21/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

Association of Attorney

3/20/2023: Association of Attorney

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore By: Christina Dominguez, CSR# 12516; Filed by: Chen Hu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Plaintiffs Updated IDC Statement for Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Guannan Shi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketResponse Response to Plaintiffs' Unilateral Additional IDC Statement; Filed by: Plaza Mexico Residences, LLC (Defendant); Plaza Mexico Residences II, LLC (Defendant); M&D Regional Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for Christopher T. Tirrell (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Guannan Shi (Plaintiff); Chen Hu (Plaintiff); Guo Kun (Plaintiff); Peng Jing (Plaintiff); Xioaping Cao (Plaintiff); Jianchi Chen (Plaintiff); Yubing Yuan (Plaintiff); As to: Plaza Mexico Residences, LLC (Defendant); Plaza Mexico Residences II, LLC (Defendant); M&D Regional Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guannan Shi (Plaintiff); Chen Hu (Plaintiff); Guo Kun (Plaintiff); Peng Jing (Plaintiff); Xioaping Cao (Plaintiff); Jianchi Chen (Plaintiff); Yubing Yuan (Plaintiff); As to: Plaza Mexico Residences, LLC (Defendant); Plaza Mexico Residences II, LLC (Defendant); M&D Regional Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guannan Shi (Plaintiff); Chen Hu (Plaintiff); Guo Kun (Plaintiff); Peng Jing (Plaintiff); Xioaping Cao (Plaintiff); Jianchi Chen (Plaintiff); Yubing Yuan (Plaintiff); As to: Plaza Mexico Residences, LLC (Defendant); Plaza Mexico Residences II, LLC (Defendant); M&D Regional Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Guannan Shi (Plaintiff); Chen Hu (Plaintiff); Guo Kun (Plaintiff); Peng Jing (Plaintiff); Xioaping Cao (Plaintiff); Jianchi Chen (Plaintiff); Yubing Yuan (Plaintiff); As to: Plaza Mexico Residences, LLC (Defendant); Plaza Mexico Residences II, LLC (Defendant); M&D Regional Center, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less