This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 14:01:38 (UTC).

GUANJUN SUN VS TOTALLY CHI LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 GUANJUN SUN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOTALLY CHI LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0805

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN GUANJUN

Defendants

AMAZING COMFORT LLC

CHENG LIU RI

NABUA MARK

TOTALLY CHI LLC

TOTALLY CHI REFLEXOLOGY INC.

TOTALLY CHI REFLEXOLOGY LLC

WALDREP YUMEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEROPIAN EDISSON

Defendant Attorney

SHEN CHUNPING

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Totally CHI LLC (Defendant); Yumei Waldrep (Defendant); Mark NABUA (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guanjun SUN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guanjun SUN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guanjun SUN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Eddison