This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:32:38 (UTC).

GUANGYU XIE VS NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 GUANGYU XIE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7002

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XIE GUANGYU

Defendant

NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUAN HELEN

Defendant Attorney

WOOTTON SAUNDRA KAYE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RELEASING JUDGMENT ...)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RELEASING JUDGMENT ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RELEASE JUDGMENT LIEN

3/3/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RELEASE JUDGMENT LIEN

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RELEASE JUDGMENT LIEN

3/3/2021: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RELEASE JUDGMENT LIEN

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RELEASING JUDGMENT LIEN

3/1/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RELEASING JUDGMENT LIEN

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RELEASING JUDGMENT LIEN

3/1/2021: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RELEASING JUDGMENT LIEN

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/21/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

4/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff); Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Releasing Judgment Lien) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANT NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLC?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RELEASE JUDGMENT LIEN); Filed by Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Releasing Judgment ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketObjection (DEFENDANT NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II, LLC?S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RELEASE JUDGMENT LIEN); Filed by Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order Releasing Judgment Lien); Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (to Ex Parte Application for Order Releasing Judgment Lien); Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guangyu Xie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less