This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 01:55:16 (UTC).

GUADALUPE NORIEGA ET AL VS ALEJANDRO BARTUREN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by GUADALUPE NORIEGA against ALEJANDRO BARTUREN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3942

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

MARROQUIN ROBERTO

NORIEGA GUADALUPE

Respondents and Defendants

BARTUREN ALEJANDRO

DOES 1 TO 10

BARTUREN SVEA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

2/14/2018: REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

6/4/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

Minute Order

6/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/27/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE

8/13/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/15/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Case Management Statement

11/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Declaration

11/16/2018: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/16/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Notice

12/31/2018: Notice

Case Management Order

2/15/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order

2/15/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. TORTIOUS BREACH OF THE WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (NEGLAGENCE), ETC

3/27/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. TORTIOUS BREACH OF THE WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (NEGLAGENCE), ETC

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

2/14/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

SUMMONS

2/14/2018: SUMMONS

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (RESanctions against counsel for defendant for failure to appear on 11/28/18) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: RE: Sanct...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by Guadalupe Noriega (Plaintiff); Roberto Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Guadalupe Noriega (Plaintiff); Roberto Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR 1. TORTIOUS BREACH OF THE WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (NEGLIGENCE); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Guadalupe Noriega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Roberto Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Guadalupe Noriega (Plaintiff); Roberto Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693942    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 26

The Court is inclined to grant the Petitions on behalf of Dannie Marroquin, Danna Marroquin, and Danny Marroquin, brought by Guardian ad litem Guadalupe Noriega, to Approve Compromise of Pending Action. The Court has reviewed the petitions and finds the settlement fair and reasonable. The parties have an agreement for attorney’s fees, which is attached to the petition, and the Declaration of Counsel is sufficient to substantiate the work performed in connection with this matter. The Petitions are properly verified by Petitioner. There is a substantial amount going to each Claimant.

The Court notes, however, discrepancies that must be corrected for the Petitions and Orders for claimants Danna Marroquin and Dannie Marroquin.

The birthdate provided for Danna Marroquin is inconsistent between the Petition (MC-350) and the proposed Orders (MC-351 and MC-355). Item 2b of the Petition states that the Danna Marroquin’s birthdate is “1/19/2007.” However, the proposed orders on forms MC-351 and MC-355 state that Danna Marroquin’s birthdate is “1/18/07.” Prior to the hearing, Petitioner must electronically file and serve an amended Petition (MC-350), an amended Order on form MC-351, and/or an amended Order on form MC-355 reflecting the correct birthdate for Danna Marroquin. Petitioner must also bring conformed copies of: the amended Petition (MC-350), amended Order on form MC-351, and amended Order on form MC-355 to the hearing.

The gross and net amounts to be paid to claimant Dannie Marroquin are inconsistent. Items 11a, 11c, and 12b of the Petition (MC-350) for Dannie Marroquin state that the amount to be paid to this claimant will be $2,000; items 14a, 17c, and 17e state that attorney’s fees of $500 will be deducted, leaving a net recovery of $1,500 for Dannie Marroquin (in items 16 and 17f). However, Attachment 12 and 14a (paragraph 15) of the Petition (MC-350) and item 7a of the proposed order (MC-351) for Dannie Marroquin state that the amount to be paid to this claimant will be $3,000 (not $2,000). Item 7c(1)(a) and 7e of the proposed order (MC-351) for Dannie Marroquin state that attorney’s fees of $750 (not $500) will be deducted, leaving a net recovery of $2,250 (not $1,500) for Dannie Marroquin (in items 7c(2) and 7c(2)(a) of the proposed order on form MC-351 and item 4 of the proposed order on form MC-355). Prior to the hearing, Petitioner must electronically file and serve an amended Petition (MC-350), an amended Order on form MC-351, and an amended Order on form MC-355 reflecting the correct amounts regarding Dannie Marroquin’s recovery under the settlement agreement. Petitioner must also bring conformed copies of: the amended Petition (MC-350), amended Order on form MC-351, and amended Order on form MC-355 to the hearing.

If Petitioner fails to bring to the hearing conformed copies of: the amended Petition (MC-350), amended Order on form MC-351, and amended Order on form MC-355 for both Danna Marroquin and Dannie Marroquin, then that petition will be continued to the next available reservation on CRS or denied without prejudice.

Per CRC Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimants are required to attend the hearing on the petition. The Court will therefore require attendance at the hearing in order to grant the petition.