This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2020 at 07:53:23 (UTC).

GUADALUPE NENE VS MIRIAM PRECIADO

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 GUADALUPE NENE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIRIAM PRECIADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9037

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NENE GUADALUPE

Defendants and Respondents

PRECIADO MIRIAM

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KHAKSHOOY BOB B. ESQ.

AGARWAL SANDEEP GOPAL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HILLIER DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/9/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION

5/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION

Proof of Service by Mail

5/14/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/14/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

4/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION

4/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

4/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

Proof of Service by Mail

4/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

4/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

4/28/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/28/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/26/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

1/9/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/6/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

SUMMONS -

6/6/2018: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGFS FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAIUNG, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NEGLIGENT TRAINING; A

6/6/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGFS FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAIUNG, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NEGLIGENT TRAINING; A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Hearing03/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Hearing02/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Miriam Preciado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Guadalupe Nene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Guadalupe Nene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM); Filed by Guadalupe Nene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF SUSPENSION); Filed by Guadalupe Nene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Miriam Preciado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Miriam Preciado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Miriam Preciado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Miriam Preciado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Miriam Preciado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Guadalupe Nene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guadalupe Nene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGFS FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAIUNG, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NEGLIGENT TRAINING; AND ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709037    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RE-OPEN DISCOVERY

On June 6, 208, plaintiff Guadalupe Nene (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Miriam Preciado (“Defendant”) for injuries and damages relating to a June 10, 2016 automobile accident. Defendant filed her answer on January 19, 2019. Trial is currently scheduled for March 30, 2020. Defendant requests a trial continuance to August 3, 2020 to accommodate a medical examination scheduled for May 5, 2020.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

The motion is unopposed, and Defendant submits that the parties have stipulated to the proposed trial date. No continuances have been granted in this matter before although the parties have attempted to stipulate several times. The first stipulation filed on September 29, 2019 was rejected because the e-filing system was unable to process the document. The second stipulation filed on January 24, 2020 was rejected because it was after the case’s two-year mark.

Good cause exists for the trial to be continued to allow the exam on May 5, 2020. Defendant’s unopposed motion is GRANTED. Trial is continued to August 3, 2020.  The Final Status Conference is continued to July 20, 2020.  All discovery and motion cutoff dates are based on the new trial date.  The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses and experts of the new date immediately.  The Court has granted this continuance to the date jointly selected by the parties. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel, witnesses and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.