This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:46:22 (UTC).

GUADALUPE MABRA VS KATHARYN LOUISE SCHALL GRILL ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 GUADALUPE MABRA filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against KATHARYN LOUISE SCHALL GRILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6677

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

MABRA MANUEL

MABRA GUADALUPE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

MFTDS INC

KATHARYN LOUISE SCHALL GRILL

SCHAUER RUSSELL TERRY

SAKSA LLC

PACIFIC LENDING CAPITAL GROUP INC

MASTER FUNDING CO

MACARTHUR EAST LLC

STEPHEN WHEELER

PS FUNDING INC

GOLDEN ARROW HEAD LLC

DOES 1-100

EUGENE E. COMBES

ANDREA WHEELER

GRILL KATHARYN LOUISE SCHALL

WHEELER STEPHEN

COMBES EUGENE E.

WHEELER ANDREA

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

SCHAUER RUSSELL TERRY

MABRA MANUEL

SAKSA LLC

PACIFIC LENDING CAPITAL GROUP INC

MABRA GUADALUPE

MASTER FUNDING CO

MACARTHUR EAST LLC

GOLDEN ARROW HEAD LLC

GRILL KATHARYN LOUISE SCHALL

WHEELER STEPHEN

COMBES EUGENE E.

WHEELER ANDREA

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

FU DAVID DAI-WUNG ESQ.

FU DAVID D. ESQ.

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FU DAVID D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LUSHANKO LARRY GENE

ESQ POWER LAW P.C/STACIE L.

POWER STACIE LYNN

LOWENTHAL JEFFREY HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Order

11/5/2018: Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/26/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Exhibit List

4/4/2019: Exhibit List

Notice

5/8/2019: Notice

Request for Refund / Order

5/22/2019: Request for Refund / Order

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

2/6/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/27/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANTS KATIIARYN LOUISE. SCHALL GRILL. RUSSELL TERRY SCHAUER. PACIFIC LENDING CAPITAL GROUP, INC., MACARTHUR EAST LJLC., GOLDEN ARROWHEAD LLC. AND SAKSA, LLC.'S VERJFWD ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF PLAI

4/11/2018: DEFENDANTS KATIIARYN LOUISE. SCHALL GRILL. RUSSELL TERRY SCHAUER. PACIFIC LENDING CAPITAL GROUP, INC., MACARTHUR EAST LJLC., GOLDEN ARROWHEAD LLC. AND SAKSA, LLC.'S VERJFWD ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF PLAI

NOTICE RE CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT EUGENE E. COMEES

4/12/2018: NOTICE RE CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT EUGENE E. COMEES

PS FUNDING, INC.'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' VERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/23/2018: PS FUNDING, INC.'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/8/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS GUADALUPE MABRA AND MANUEL MABRA'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT PS FUNDING INC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/8/2018: PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS GUADALUPE MABRA AND MANUEL MABRA'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT PS FUNDING INC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/3/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO MFTDS? CROSS-COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS GUADALUPE MABRA AND MANUEL MABRA

7/10/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO MFTDS? CROSS-COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS GUADALUPE MABRA AND MANUEL MABRA

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by GUADALUPE MABRA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Entry of Judgement or Order [4/26/19 - Order to Continue Trial]); Filed by PS Funding Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (to continue trial date pursuant to stipulation of all parties); Filed by PS Funding Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation of All Parties to Continue Trial Date); Filed by PS Funding Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & VERIFIED CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1, FRAUD;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC686677    Hearing Date: August 17, 2020    Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Guadalupe Mabra and

Manuel Mabra,

Both as trustees for the Mabra Family Trust dated 4/15/2005

OPPOSITION: Defendant Eugene Combs (in pro per)

Plaintiffs Guadalupe Mabra and Manuel Mabra, as trustees for the Mabra Family Trust dated 4/15/2005 (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), allege that Defendant Eugene Combs (“Defendant”) induced them to invest in real property with false representations.

On December 12, 2017, Plaintiffs filed their initial Complaint naming Defendant and several co-defendants. Defendant failed to file an answer and a default was entered against him on May 8, 2018. In January 2020, Plaintiffs filed a Request for Default Judgment against Defendant.

On February 13, 2020, Defendant, who is self-represented, filed an answer to Plaintiffs’ Complaint. On March 9, 2020, Plaintiffs filed the instant motion to strike Defendant’s answer. On August 11, 2020, Defendant filed an opposition.

Standard: Self-represented individuals are held to the same standards as a party represented by counsel. Nwosu v. Uba (2004) 122 Cal.App.4th 1229, 1247.

California Code of Civil Procedure § 436 subd. (b) states that a court upon a motion or in its discretion may: “(b) Strike out all or any part of any pleading not drawn or filed in conformity with the laws of this state, a court rule, or an order of the court.”

Analysis: GRANTED

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MFTDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MASTER FUNDING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where PS FUNDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FU DAVID DAIWUNG