This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 06:33:21 (UTC).

GUADALUPE LOERA VS ACCESS SERVICES ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 GUADALUPE LOERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACCESS SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, RICHARD L. FRUIN and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8328

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

RICHARD L. FRUIN

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOERA GUADALUPE

Defendants and Respondents

MOORE MICHAEL

SAN GABRIEL TRANSIT INC.

ACCESS SERVICES

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAYBALL JOSEPH C. ESQ.

DAYBALL JOSEPH C. III

DAYBALL JOSEPH C. III ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MOORE KENTON E.

MOORE KENTON E

MOORE KENTON E. ESQ.

ESTEN LAWRENCE DAVID

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

9/8/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/10/2020

4/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

1/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Complaint

5/31/2018: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AUGMENT OR AMEND EXPERT WITNESS LIST; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

12/24/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AUGMENT OR AMEND EXPERT WITNESS LIST; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH C. DAYBALL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AUGMENT OR AMEND EXPERT WITNESS LIST

12/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH C. DAYBALL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AUGMENT OR AMEND EXPERT WITNESS LIST

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO RFP AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

6/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO RFP AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/27/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

12/6/2018: Notice - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

5/31/2018: SUMMONS -

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Hearing02/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Michael Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion to Augment Record - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Guadalupe Loera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Augment Record)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant); Michael Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Access Services (Defendant); San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant); Michael Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Guadalupe Loera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Guadalupe Loera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Guadalupe Loera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guadalupe Loera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708328    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE R. FRUIN presiding in Department 15 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.