Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 13:22:11 (UTC).

GUADALUPE LADINO VS THE RED FLAVOR TABLE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 GUADALUPE LADINO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE RED FLAVOR TABLE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0759

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LADINO GUADALUPE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DUCKETT-WILSON DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

THE RED FLAVOR TABLE LLC

ROES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES GARRETT JAMAL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DALMORE JEAN A.

BOUCHE JACQUELINE

MICHAEL CHRISTINA FERRERI

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

5/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

4/5/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/8/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney within Firm); Filed by Duckett-Wilson Development Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Duckett-Wilson Development Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Duckett-Wilson Development Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Duckett-Wilson Development Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Duckett-Wilson Development Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Red Flavor Table LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by The Red Flavor Table LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Ladino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Ladino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Ladino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guadalupe Ladino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guadalupe Ladino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guadalupe Ladino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUCKETT-WILSON DEVELOPMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES GARRETT JAMAL