This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 00:30:20 (UTC).

GUADALUPE IBARRA, ET AL. VS OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 GUADALUPE IBARRA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9101

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBARRA GUADALUPE

Defendants

OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE LLC

ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE SARIO JAMES ALEXANDER

NOURMAND MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

KENNEDY TRACEY ADANO

YANG YONGQING DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (PAG...)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (PAG...)

Order - ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT

11/10/2021: Order - ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUADALUPE IBARRA IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT

10/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUADALUPE IBARRA IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT

Motion re: - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT

10/7/2021: Motion re: - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SARRAO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

10/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SARRAO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

8/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Notice of Ruling

8/23/2021: Notice of Ruling

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

8/12/2021: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

8/12/2021: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SARRAO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

8/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SARRAO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE JULY 12, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE AND SET DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF STIPULATED PAGA SETTLEMENT

6/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE JULY 12, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE AND SET DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF STIPULATED PAGA SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

5/17/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER VACATING JANUARY 20, 2021, STATUS CONFERENCE

1/12/2021: Order - ORDER VACATING JANUARY 20, 2021, STATUS CONFERENCE

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

5/4/2021: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

1/7/2021: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS, AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

9/11/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS, AND STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance with the Terms of the Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement ((PAGA ONLY)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder and Judgment Approving PAGA Settlement; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (PAG...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Guadalupe Ibarra in Support Motion for Approval of Paga Representative Action Settlement); Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael Sarrao in Support of Joint Stipulation for Approval of PAGA Settlement); Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion for Approval of PAGA Representative Action Settlement; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation for Approval of PAGA Settlement; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff); Olympia Health Care, LLC (Defendant); Alecto Healthcare Service LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:28 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/17/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guadalupe Ibarra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yang, Y. Douglas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY TRACEY A.