Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 04:49:10 (UTC).

GUADALUPE CAVAZOS BALADEZ VS THE VONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 GUADALUPE CAVAZOS BALADEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE VONS COMPANIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2552

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALADEZ GUADALUPE CAVAZOS

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

THE VONS COMPANIES INC.

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB HOLDINGS LLC

ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC

NEW ALBERTSON'S INC.

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

ALBERTSONS MANAGEMENT HOLDCO LLC

ALBERTSON'S HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLRED CYNTHIA ELAINE

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS AMY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULAITON RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC; ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; NEW ALBERTSON'S INC.; ALBERTSON'S LLC; ALBERTSON'S STORES SU

5/23/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULAITON RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC; ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; NEW ALBERTSON'S INC.; ALBERTSON'S LLC; ALBERTSON'S STORES SU

Answer - Answer to Complaint

3/5/2019: Answer - Answer to Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

1/30/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

1/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/24/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/24/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulaiton Re: Dismissal of Defendants Albertsons Companies LLC; Albertsons Companies, Inc.; New Albertson's Inc.; Albertson's LLC; Albertson's Stores Sub LLC; Albertson's Stores Sub Holdings LLC; Albertson's Management Holdco, LLC; Albertson's Realty L); Filed by The Vons Companies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by The Vons Companies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guadalupe Cavazos Baladez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albertson's Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSONS STORES, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW ALBERTSON'S INC is a litigant