This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 10:48:57 (UTC).

GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9399

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASA DE ROSA ACQUISITIONS LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

CORNERSTONE LONGWOOD SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GT MADISON REALTY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LAFAYETTE SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

NORTH AMERICAN SENIOR PROPERTIES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

RED ROCK LAS VEGAS SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS LP A NEVADA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

CARE LIVING CENTERS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CASA DE ROSA LEASING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CORNERSTONE LONGWOOD LEASING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LAFAYETTE LEASING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MADISON SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN CAMILLA Y.

Defendant Attorney

CHANDLER PAUL W.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

7/21/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/24/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/23/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/23/2023: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/23/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/23/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/23/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Default Judgment

3/7/2023: Default Judgment

Default Judgment

3/7/2023: Default Judgment

Default Judgment

3/7/2023: Default Judgment

Default Judgment

3/7/2023: Default Judgment

Default Judgment

3/7/2023: Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RENE LEUNG IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT'S JUDGMENT AGAINST CASE DE ROSA LEASING, LLC

2/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RENE LEUNG IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT'S JUDGMENT AGAINST CASE DE ROSA LEASING, LLC

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CAMILLA CHAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT'S JUDGMENT AGAINST CASA DE ROSA LEASING, LLC

2/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CAMILLA CHAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT'S JUDGMENT AGAINST CASA DE ROSA LEASING, LLC

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/28/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/28/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/28/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/28/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2024
  • Hearing01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Camilla Y. Chan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Raines Feldman to RAINES FELDMAN LITTRELL LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketAddress for Camilla Y. Chan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketNotice OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS; Filed by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: LAFAYETTE LEASING, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: CASA DE ROSA LEASING, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); RED ROCK LAS VEGAS SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Nevada limited partnership (Plaintiff); VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); CASA DE ROSA ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); CORNERSTONE LONGWOOD SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); LAFAYETTE SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); NORTH AMERICAN SENIOR PROPERTIES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); CARE LIVING CENTERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); RED ROCK LAS VEGAS SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Nevada limited partnership (Plaintiff); VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); CASA DE ROSA ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); CORNERSTONE LONGWOOD SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); LAFAYETTE SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); NORTH AMERICAN SENIOR PROPERTIES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); CARE LIVING CENTERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GT MADISON REALTY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); RED ROCK LAS VEGAS SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Nevada limited partnership (Plaintiff); VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); CASA DE ROSA ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); CORNERSTONE LONGWOOD SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); LAFAYETTE SENIOR LIVING ACQUISITIONS, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); NORTH AMERICAN SENIOR PROPERTIES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff); As to: RED ROCK SENIOR LIVING LEASING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); CARE LIVING CENTERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); VILLA MARCHE STOCKTON LEASING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less