This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 09:33:44 (UTC).

GRIGOR DEMIRCHIAN VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 GRIGOR DEMIRCHIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3503

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMIRCHIAN GRIGOR

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

LITHIA BMW OF SHERMAN OAKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

ROTMAN AMY

Defendant Attorney

WAGNER CHARLES BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

3/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

3/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GEORGES HADDAD IN SUPPORT OF DEEMING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS AS MOOT AND TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GEORGES HADDAD IN SUPPORT OF DEEMING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS AS MOOT AND TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

2/22/2023: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/22/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

2/22/2023: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMY ROTMAN

2/22/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMY ROTMAN

Declaration - DECLARATION AMY ROTMAN

2/22/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION AMY ROTMAN

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/22/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply - REPLY BMW'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

9/8/2022: Reply - REPLY BMW'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

Reply - REPLY BMW'S REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO BMW'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/8/2022: Reply - REPLY BMW'S REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO BMW'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Request for Judicial Notice

9/8/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection - OBJECTION BMW'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

9/8/2022: Objection - OBJECTION BMW'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/13/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDI...)

9/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL PROCEEDI...)

Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

9/13/2022: Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2023
  • Hearing10/23/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • Hearing07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted to Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks, Set One scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted to BMW of North America, LLC, Set One; scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF GEORGES HADDAD IN SUPPORT OF DEEMING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS AS MOOT AND TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAddress for Norman F. Taylor (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Grigor Demirchian (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Lithia BMW of Sherman Oaks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less