Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 00:42:35 (UTC).

GRETCHEN LENORE SAWYER VS JULIAN ALEXANDER GOUNGO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 GRETCHEN LENORE SAWYER filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JULIAN ALEXANDER GOUNGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1457

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAWYER GRETCHEN LENORE

Defendants

LODGE ERIC L.

HENDERSON BRIANNA M.

GOUNGO JULIAN ALEXANDER

KRATKY GEORGINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

11/30/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Hearing04/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gretchen Lenore Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gretchen Lenore Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gretchen Lenore Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gretchen Lenore Sawyer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.