This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 06:25:59 (UTC).

GRETA MATHEWS VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 GRETA MATHEWS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4742

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHEWS GRETA

Defendants

ASSIGNMENT AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

AYA HEALTHCARE LOCAL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT

CROSS COUNTRY STAFFING INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

MEDISCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSE ADAM

ROSE ADAM MORRIS

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/30/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Greta Mathews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Greta Mathews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Greta Mathews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Greta Mathews (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDSCAN DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cross Country Staffing, Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSE ADAM MORRIS