This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 16:47:32 (UTC).

GRETA BABAIAN, ET AL. VS WOODLAND77, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 GRETA BABAIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WOODLAND77, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0417

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDOVAL JULIO JR.

LEDEZMA JOEL

CASTRO ANA D

GOMEZ MARBILA

RODRIGUEZ MARTINEZ ROBERTO JOSE

PORTILLO MARIA JOSE

VACA MEZA MANUEL

BARRIOS DE LEON ANIBAL DESIDERIO

CASTRO ANGELO F

LEDEZMA MARIA T.

PENA MORALES JAIME

BOONYARATSUNTRON SIRIN

FOSTER ASHLEY

LEMUS ABRAHAM

BOONYARAT LITAL

MONTES DE OCA MARIA

SANCHEZ GERSON

TAPIA GLENDY

ORTEZ GABRIELA ZAMIRA

Defendant

BLACKHAWK914 LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

65 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAMZON DANIEL

HERMANSEN KEVIN

Defendant Attorneys

SAFARIAN HARRY A.

GARDNER MATTHEW AUSTIN

GLOCER JOSHUA GARY

BABAIAN PIERRO H.

RAJAZI NEDDA ROCHELLE

SLAUGHTER WILLIAM M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/13/2020: Answer

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING

10/26/2020: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

10/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Case Management Statement

9/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...) OF 09/23/2020

9/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...) OF 09/23/2020

Reply - REPLY DEFS. DM REPLY

9/16/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFS. DM REPLY

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS WOODMAN77, LLC AND BLACKHAWK914, LP

9/9/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS WOODMAN77, LLC AND BLACKHAWK914, LP

Case Management Statement

9/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF YALE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

9/8/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF YALE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/7/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/11/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/11/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. HEIMBERG RE: MEET AND CONFER AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

5/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. HEIMBERG RE: MEET AND CONFER AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Woodman77, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BLACKHAWK914 , LP a Delaware limited partnership (Defendant); Woodman 77, LLC, a Delware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UNITED NORDHOFF APARTMENT , LLC California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by YALE MANAGEMENT SERVICES , INC a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Telephonic Appearance) of 04/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Greta Babaian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Greta Babaian (Plaintiff); Samuel A. Barahona (Plaintiff); Anibal Alexander Barrios (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Carla Cabrera (Plaintiff); Vardan Kilinian (Plaintiff); Greta Babaian (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vardan Kilinian (Plaintiff); Carla Cabrera (Plaintiff); Greta Babaian (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vardan Kilinian (Plaintiff); Carla Cabrera (Plaintiff); Greta Babaian (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vardan Kilinian (Plaintiff); Carla Cabrera (Plaintiff); Greta Babaian (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carla Cabrera (Plaintiff); Vardan Kilinian (Plaintiff); Greta Babaian (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAJAZI NEDDA ROCHELLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BABAIAN PIERRO H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOCER JOSHUA GARY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARDNER MATTHEW AUSTIN