This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 07:22:04 (UTC).

GRESHAM LOMBARD VS CHEVRON CORPORATION ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 GRESHAM LOMBARD filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against CHEVRON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9207

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOMBARD GRESHAM

Defendants

ALLWASTE INC

CHEVRON CORPORATION

KERN OIL & REFINING COMPANY

MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP

MOBIL OIL REFINING CORPORATION

ONYX SERVICES LLC

PBF ENERGY

PHILIP SERVICES CORPORATION

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

SAN JOAQUIN REFINING COMPANY INC.

SHELL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC

TIMEC ACQUISITIONS INC.

TIMEC COMPANY INC.

TIMEC SERVICES COMPANY INC.

VALERO REFINING COMPANY - CALIFORNIA

WASTE MANAGEMENT LLC

RUSH RESOURCES LLC

PBF ENERGY LIMITED DOE NO. 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUST SCOTT P

METZGER RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/13/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/13/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/16/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

6/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 06/24/2022

6/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 06/24/2022

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 06/22/2022

6/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 06/22/2022

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/30/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:02 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 06/24/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docketat 10:55 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Non-Complex Determination) of 06/22/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Non-Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Posting Jury Fees); Filed by Gresham Lombard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN JOAQUIN REFINING CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELL OIL PRODUCTS US is a litigant

Latest cases where MOBIL OIL REFINING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VALERO REFINING COMPANY-CALIFORNIA is a litigant