This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 21:17:25 (UTC).

GREGORY SPAIN, ET AL. VS CAROLINE BAKER

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 GREGORY SPAIN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAROLINE BAKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5625

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SPAIN DENNIS

Defendant

BAKER CAROLINE

Cross Plaintiff

GUYTON CAROLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAADIAN BOBBY

Defendant Attorneys

DUCEY MITCHELL F.

MASSERMAN TERRI LYNN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

2/27/2023: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

2/14/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

11/7/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED - DUPLICATE

9/26/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED - DUPLICATE

Request for Dismissal

9/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, CROSS-COMPLAINT PENDING.

9/13/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED, CROSS-COMPLAINT PENDING.

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

9/8/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

6/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

4/6/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/6/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

10/26/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GREGORY

10/26/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GREGORY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/1/2021: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GREGORY

11/1/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GREGORY

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Gregory Spain, et al. on 09/28/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Gregory Spain and Dennis Spain as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Gregory Spain (Plaintiff); Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); As to: Caroline Baker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 03/14/2023; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); As to: Gregory Spain (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous): Filed By: Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); Result: Reviewed ; As To Parties changed from Gregory Spain (Plaintiff) to Gregory Spain (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: As To Parties: ; Status changed from Rejected to Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by: Gregory Spain (Plaintiff); Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); As to: Caroline Baker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Gregory Spain (Plaintiff),Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); Result: Rejected; Result Date: 09/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gregory Spain (Plaintiff); Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); As to: Caroline Baker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 09/28/2021 to 09/28/2021; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 09/28/2021 to 09/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Gregory Spain (Plaintiff); Dennis Spain (Plaintiff); As to: Caroline Baker (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less