This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 15:46:48 (UTC).

GREGORY SADOFSKY VS BRUCE S. HALPRIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 GREGORY SADOFSKY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRUCE S HALPRIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5637

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADOFSKY GREGORY

Defendants

CURRENCE RACHEL

RFF FAMILY PARTHERSHIP L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

4146 BECK AVENUE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SYLVE LAINE

HALPRIN BRUCE S.

AU LENDING SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

REBIDO ZEVA

COSATO NICK

M & S CLASSIC STONE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RILEY GRANT K.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice

3/6/2019: Notice

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/27/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons

2/19/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

2/19/2019: Unknown

Complaint

2/19/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice (name extension) ( of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens); Filed by Gregory Sadofsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Gregory Sadofsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Gregory Sadofsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Gregory Sadofsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gregory Sadofsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by Gregory Sadofsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY GRANT K.