This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 17:21:28 (UTC).

GREGORY RUSH VS RANDOLPH WATKINS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 GREGORY RUSH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RANDOLPH WATKINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, THOMAS D. LONG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8890

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

RUSH GREGORY

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

KHACHATUROV KAMO

WATKINS RANDOLPH

DOES 1 TO 50

KHACHATUROVA GAYANE

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WATKINS RANDOLPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HANASSAB FRED F. ESQ.

HANASSAB FARIBORZ FRED ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

RAFFALOW BRETOI & ADAMS

BARRY KEVIN E. ESQ.

BARRY KEVIN EUGENE ESQ.

ALLEN KEITH LASALLE ESQ.

HAMILTON SUSAN MARIE ESQ.

RACKOHN CRAIG DONALD

DESALERNOS STEFANIE CHRISTINE ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY KEVIN EUGENE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUE...) OF 10/28/2021

10/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUE...) OF 10/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUE...)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUE...)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUES...)

6/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUES...)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/3/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S DECLARATION RE MOTION

4/23/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S DECLARATION RE MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)

4/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE) OF 04/30/2021

4/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE) OF 04/30/2021

Notice of Ruling

5/6/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRED HANASSAB REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE

4/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRED HANASSAB REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE

Motion to Bifurcate

1/6/2021: Motion to Bifurcate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 07/31/2020

7/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 07/31/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/30/2020

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • Hearing04/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to File a Request Entry of Default as to Defendants Kamo Khachaturov and Gayane Khachaturova) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File a Reque...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File a Reque...) of 10/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to File a Request Entry of Default as to Defendants Kamo Khachaturov and Gayane Khachaturova) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File a Reque...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to File a Request Entry of Default as to Defendants Kamo Khachaturov and Gayane Khachaturova) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint (for Implied Indemnity and Total Indemnity; Declaratory Relief and Apportionment of Fault); Filed by Randolph Watkins (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY AND TOTAL INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Randolph Watkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gregory Rush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gregory Rush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gregory Rush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Gregory Rush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC668890    Hearing Date: April 30, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

GREGORY RUSH,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

RANDOLPH WATKINS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC668890

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

April 30, 2021

 

Defendant’s motion to bifurcate is denied without prejudice to Defendant raising this issue for the trial judge to consider, on its own motion, at the time that the judge rules upon motions in limine.  The Court orders that the bifurcation briefing be included in the trial binders in Tab B along with any motions in limine filed in the case.  The Court recognizes that CRC Rule 3.57(c) states, “A motion in limine may not be used for the purpose of seeking an order to try an issue before the trial of another issue or issues,” and thus this order should not be construed in a way that contradicts this rule.  Defendant may direct the trial court to this order, which should not be construed to in any way bind the trial court in making a bifurcation decision on its own motion.

Defendant properly sought a bifurcation order in advance of the trial date.  See CCP §598 (court to issue order bifurcating case on noticed motion by the pretrial conference or, absent a pretrial conference, no later than 30 days in advance of trial).  However, a trial court may also “on its own motion . . . make such an order at any time.” Id.

On the facts of this case, and given that in the Personal Injury Court system this case will be tried by a different court than the court ruling on this motion, the Court finds it appropriate for the trial judge to determine whether bifurcation is warranted.  In the PI Court system, the trial court rules on motions in limine, even those that significantly affect trial preparation.  While this bifurcation request is not a motion in limine, the logic of having the trial judge determine it here is similar.  The request for bifurcation here appears to be one for which the trial judge should make a discretionary determination based on its experience.

Accordingly, the Court denies this motion without prejudice.

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 30th day of April, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY KEVIN E. ESQ.