This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 21:15:35 (UTC).

GREGORY P. HANNLEY VS YAHYA NAVAB, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 GREGORY P HANNLEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against YAHYA NAVAB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1844

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNLEY GREGORY P.

Defendants

IMANIRAD FARIBA

NAVAB YAHYA AKA JOHN NAVAB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIC STEVEN S.

Defendant Attorneys

BLEISTEIN DAVID PAUL

ROSEN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

8/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

7/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lis Pendens

10/21/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Complaint

10/18/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF STIP TO CONTINUE

7/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STIP TO CONTINUE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER [CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6]

2/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER [CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6]

Request for Dismissal

2/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

11/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/7/2020: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/11/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/31/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/1/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order [Code of Civil Procedure 664.6]); Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by YAHYA NAVAB (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by YAHYA NAVAB (Defendant); FARIBA IMANIRAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Related Cases;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Related Case); Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by YAHYA NAVAB (Defendant); FARIBA IMANIRAD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GREGORY P. HANNLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLEISTEIN DAVID PAUL