This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 09:29:40 (UTC).

GREGORY L. CLAYMAN VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 GREGORY L CLAYMAN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4802

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAYMAN GREGORY L.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

"BERNIE" BERNHEIM STEVEN J.

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG A

HUESTON JOHN C.

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/18/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/18/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/23/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (EDISON INTERNATIONAL)

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (EDISON INTERNATIONAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/26/2022

5/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY)

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/26/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/26/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

5/31/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

6/3/2022: Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

6/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute [21SMCV01768]; F...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other of Bakla...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/22/2022 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel all attys for Str...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Craig A Fligor (Attorney): Middle Name changed from A. to A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: Gregory L. Clayman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gregory L. Clayman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gregory L. Clayman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gregory L. Clayman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES