This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 00:41:28 (UTC).

GREGORY K KEVILLE ET AL VS CAROLE E MESSINA

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by GREGORY K KEVILLE against CAROLE E MESSINA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4584

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

KEVILLE GREGORY K

KEVILLE BRENDA

Respondents and Defendants

MESSINA CAROLE E.

DOES 1 TO 30

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; ETC

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO SPFCIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES; ETC

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO SPFCIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES; ETC

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY K. KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY K. KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC

Notice

11/14/2018: Notice

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/14/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/15/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/15/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT

6/15/2018: GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

4/30/2018: Summons

Complaint

4/30/2018: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Pritesh S Kothary, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Motion to Compel)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel); Filed by Carole E. Messina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO SPFCIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY K. KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL BRENDA KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL GREGORY KEVILLE'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Carole E. Messina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • General Denial; Filed by Carole E. Messina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gregory K Keville (Plaintiff); Brenda Keville (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Gregory K Keville (Plaintiff); Brenda Keville (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704584    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

GREGORY KEVILLE, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

CAROLE E. MESSINA,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC704584

Hearing Date: March 9, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO CONTINUE

Plaintiff filed a motion to continue the trial date to the last week of April or the first week of May 2020. Before the hearing, the Court (Escalante, J.) granted an ex parte application and set the trial on May 4, 2020. Therefore, the Court takes this motion off-calendar. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: March 6, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court