Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 03:17:03 (UTC).

GREGORY CLAYBORN VS RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 GREGORY CLAYBORN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1175

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CLAYBORN GREGORY

Defendants and Respondents

RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE

DOES 1 TO 20

DOES 21 TO 50

GALLEMORE RON P. M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SALAZAR THEIDA

SALAZAR THEIDA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SLAVIN HOWARD ALLAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/7/2018: Minute Order

PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PESONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

8/21/2018: PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PESONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order

11/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

1/31/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Minute Order

4/17/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/17/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

2/21/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES PLAINTIFF DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

2/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES PLAINTIFF DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANTS RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE; AND RON P. GALLEMORE, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/13/2017: DEFENDANTS RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE; AND RON P. GALLEMORE, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

3/13/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 10:52 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (($60.00 fee paid in lieu of Ex-Parte)); Filed by Gregory Clayborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Court Order Re: Final Status Confe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DEFENDANTS RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE; AND RON P. GALLEMORE, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Retina Macula Institute (Defendant); Ron P. M.D. Gallemore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Retina Macula Institute (Defendant); Ron P. M.D. Gallemore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES PLAINTIFF DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Gregory Clayborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Retina Macula Institute is a litigant