This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 09:17:01 (UTC).

GREGORIO MONTANO, ET AL. VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 GREGORIO MONTANO, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2100

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLEMENTE EDNA

MONTANO GREGORIO

Defendant

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ CAMPBELL VALERIE G.

Defendant Attorney

WOLF MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/31/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/31/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/3/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GREGORIO MONTANO (Plaintiff); EDNA CLEMENTE (Plaintiff); As to: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 02/01/2023; Service Cost: 41.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GREGORIO MONTANO (Plaintiff); EDNA CLEMENTE (Plaintiff); As to: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GREGORIO MONTANO (Plaintiff); EDNA CLEMENTE (Plaintiff); As to: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GREGORIO MONTANO (Plaintiff); EDNA CLEMENTE (Plaintiff); As to: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less