Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 14:22:33 (UTC).

GREGG DAVID GINSBURG VS MOHAMMAD ALI ZADSHAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 GREGG DAVID GINSBURG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOHAMMAD ALI ZADSHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0233

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINSBURG GREGG DAVID

Defendants

BOMBINI ANNUNZIATA

MEDEX COURIER SYSTEMS A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

ZADSHAM MOHAMMAD ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINER JON M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

11/10/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

11/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/20/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GREGG DAVID GINSBURG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GREGG DAVID GINSBURG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GREGG DAVID GINSBURG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER JON MATTHEW