Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 12:16:02 (UTC).

GREG WILLIAMS VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 GREG WILLIAMS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, HOWARD L. HALM, CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8738

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

HOWARD L. HALM

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WILLIAMS GREG

Respondents and Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAW CHRISTINE

STRATEGIC LEGAL PRACTICES APC

TRACY KYLE RAINE

KIM ELEAZAR D. ESQ.

ROSENSTEIN MICHAEL H.

KIM ELEAZAR D.

SOGOYAN GREGORY

TABESH DARA

Defendant Attorneys

TAKAHASHI BRIAN ESQ.

RO ESTHER KYUNGMIN ESQ.

IHARA KARYN L.

HOM BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED ANSWER)

6/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED ANSWER)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/30/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/13/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND ADVANCING DEFENDANTS MOTION

11/27/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND ADVANCING DEFENDANTS MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DARA TABESH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DARA TABESH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN HOM ISO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APP RE MOTION TO COMPEL

12/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN HOM ISO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APP RE MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA USA, LLC'S MOTION IN LIM/NE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER INCIDENTS, ACCIDENTS, LAWSUITS, TSBS, AND CLAIMS

12/16/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA USA, LLC'S MOTION IN LIM/NE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER INCIDENTS, ACCIDENTS, LAWSUITS, TSBS, AND CLAIMS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIM/NE NUMBER 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE GOLDEN RULE (REPTILE THEORY) ARGUMENTS

12/16/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIM/NE NUMBER 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE GOLDEN RULE (REPTILE THEORY) ARGUMENTS

Objection - OBJECTION TO PURPORTED NOTICE OF ORDER FROM DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLCS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL MURRAY

12/17/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO PURPORTED NOTICE OF ORDER FROM DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLCS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL MURRAY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/17/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JACOB CUTLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES

4/23/2020: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JACOB CUTLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES

Minute Order -

4/16/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

9/5/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Appearance

11/6/2018: Notice of Appearance

Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave Notice Of Motion And Motion Of Defendant BMW Of North America, LLC For Leave To File First Amended Answer

2/13/2019: Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave Notice Of Motion And Motion Of Defendant BMW Of North America, LLC For Leave To File First Amended Answer

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/3/2018: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DE

1/3/2018: DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DE

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

7/18/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Greg Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (and Production of Documents Pursuant to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, Set Three;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Costs and Expenses) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata re Plaintiff's Reply ISO P's Motion for Attorney Fees); Filed by Greg Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
266 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Greg Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Greg Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Greg Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC668738    Hearing Date: July 14, 2020    Dept: 76

Due to the social distancing requirements and other measures implemented by the Court in response to the COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will hold the hearing on this matter telephonically at the time noted on the Court's calendar. No physical appearances will be entertained at that time. Any party wishing to appear physically to argue the motion may contact Department 76 to request that a hearing be scheduled. The Court will then continue the hearing to the earliest available hearing time that allows for appropriate social distancing.

The Court declines to issue a tentative ruling on this matter.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RO ESTHER KYUNGMIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IHARA KARYN L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOM BRIAN MING