This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 00:28:24 (UTC).

GREG WILLIAM SLEVIN VS JOHNELL TERRIS JACKSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 GREG WILLIAM SLEVIN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHNELL TERRIS JACKSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2214

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SLEVIN GREG WILLIAM

Defendants

GELCO FLEET TRUST LSR A CORPORATION

JACKSON JOHNELL TERRIS

DOES 1 TO 10

DEEGAN EXPRESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TEDFORD JAMES R.

FACCHETTI ADRIANOS MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

DOLAN MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/12/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

6/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Association of Attorney

7/2/2020: Association of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/23/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/26/2020: Answer

Application for Publication

9/18/2020: Application for Publication

Order for Publication

9/29/2020: Order for Publication

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

9/29/2020: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application for Publication

10/15/2020: Application for Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR JOHNELL

10/28/2020: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR JOHNELL

Answer

12/17/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/27/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff); Element Fleet Corporation Erroneously Sued As Gelco Fleet Trust LSR, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Johnell Terris Jackson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder for Publication (for Johnell); Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Element Fleet Corporation Erroneously Sued As Gelco Fleet Trust LSR, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Greg William Slevin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less