This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2022 at 10:57:41 (UTC).

GREG PHILLIPS VS EMAD SAMUEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 GREG PHILLIPS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMAD SAMUEL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2053

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIPS GREG

Defendants

ALPHA AND OMEGA DEVELOPMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT

ROYAL PACIFIC INTERNATIONAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SAMUEL VIOLA

SAN AGUSTIN MARK

SAN AGUSTIN MARK DBA PIONEER ENERGY/PIONEER ENERGY .0001

SAMUEL EMAD AKA EMAD AWADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

AWADA STEVEN

SHAOLIAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Motion for Reconsideration

11/10/2022: Motion for Reconsideration

Notice of Ruling

10/31/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MO...)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MO...) OF 10/25/2022

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MO...) OF 10/25/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; HE...) OF 10/21/2022

10/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; HE...) OF 10/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; HE...)

10/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; HE...)

Notice of Ruling

10/20/2022: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

10/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/10/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC, HEARING ON DEMURRER, FAILURE TO FILE POS,

10/5/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC, HEARING ON DEMURRER, FAILURE TO FILE POS,

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC...)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC...) OF 10/05/2022, STIPULATION AND ORDER

10/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC...) OF 10/05/2022, STIPULATION AND ORDER

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/14/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/12/2022

9/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMotion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Greg Phillips (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Reconsideration scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Emad Samuel (Defendant); Royal Pacific International Inc a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Emad Samuel (Defendant),Royal Pacific International Inc a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend; Result Date: 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Greg Phillips on 07/01/2022, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mo...) of 10/25/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 10/25/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 10/25/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Greg Phillips (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPHA AND OMEGA BUILDER OF JACKSONVILLE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAOLIAN MICHAEL