This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 19:27:06 (UTC).

GREG MCNAMEE VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 GREG MCNAMEE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2917

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

MCNAMEE GREG

MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS LLP

LEGAL SUPPORT NETWORK LLC

Respondents and Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES CITY ATTORNEY REVOLVING CASH FUND

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS LLP

DESMOND ALICIA RENEE

LOS ANGELES CITY ATTORNEY

PITTMAN ADRA L.

RODRIGUEZ CESAR

WALTERS CORSON LAWANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAIR ABEL P.

WINTER DOUGLAS DAVIS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PFLASTER SONIA M.

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B304713, NOA 3/3/20;

9/23/2020: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B304713, NOA 3/3/20;

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

4/28/2021: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "RESP"

5/6/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "RESP"

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

4/10/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

4/21/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPEAL - NTC DESIGNATING RECORD OF APPEAL APP-003/010/103 RESPONDENT

4/28/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPEAL - NTC DESIGNATING RECORD OF APPEAL APP-003/010/103 RESPONDENT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS'OTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUD ICATION

10/25/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS'OTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUD ICATION

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

11/20/2018: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATED EX PARTY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DATE

8/14/2019: Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATED EX PARTY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Motion of City Defts to Compel Mental Examination of Plff Gre...)

10/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Motion of City Defts to Compel Mental Examination of Plff Gre...)

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

3/3/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:3/3/20

3/4/2020: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:3/3/20

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

1/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

12/27/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

1/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Judgment - JUDGMENT - SUMMARY JUDGMENT - BEFORE TRIAL - 12/06/2019 ENTERED, PLAINTIFF TO TAKE NOTHING BY VIRTUE OF THE COMPLAINT.

12/6/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT - SUMMARY JUDGMENT - BEFORE TRIAL - 12/06/2019 ENTERED, PLAINTIFF TO TAKE NOTHING BY VIRTUE OF THE COMPLAINT.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) (AMENDED)

12/11/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) (AMENDED)

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT

12/6/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/11/2021

DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketOriginal Clerk's Transcript 4 Volumes Certified , NOA 03/3/20, B304713; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2021

DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2020

DocketNotice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B304713, NOA 3/3/20;); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2020

DocketNotice of Default ("RESP"); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketNtc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (RESPONDENT); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2020

DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Greg McNamee (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2020

DocketNtc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Greg McNamee (Appellant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2020

DocketNotice of Default; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020

DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:3/3/20); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
219 More Docket Entries
03/17/2017

DocketMinute order entered: 2017-03-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2017

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Greg McNamee (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2017

DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. DISCRIMINATION AND FAILURE TO PROVIDE REASONABLE ACCOMMODATION.ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketComplaint; Filed by Greg McNamee (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less