This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2022 at 01:12:20 (UTC).

GREG AKILI, ET AL. VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 GREG AKILI, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART M. RICE and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0934

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STUART M. RICE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AKILI GREG

ALLERS EMILY

BLACK LIVES MATTER LOS ANGELES

THOMAS SHANNON

Defendants

CASTILLO NO. 31715 CAPTAIN WARNER

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

FIGUEROA NO. 35260 LIUETENANT CARLOS

ORLIK NO. 43917 OFFICER DANIEL

PRIMO NO. 40695 OFFICER BRITTANY

Not Classified By Court

JOURNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGLAZE AIDAN CONOR

RAHMAN SHAKEER MOSTAFA

ROBINSON KATHERINE L.

WASHINGTON JOHN CLAY

ANIMASHAUN AKEEB DAMI

FLYNN COLLEEN MARIE

HOFFMAN PAUL LINDSEY

MARTIN CHRISTOPHER DAMIEN

ROWLAND WESTON CHRISTOPHER

SEPLOW MICHAEL DAVID

SOBEL CAROL ANNE

Defendant Attorneys

HORSTMANN JOHN RUSSELL

OYSTER NATHAN ANDREW

RABE ROBERT MICHAEL

STONE MICHAEL PETER

GINTER BRIAN SCOTT

BUSAILAH MUNA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

3/4/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

3/18/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

3/18/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

4/6/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

4/6/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MAY 6, 2022 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/29/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MAY 6, 2022 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)

5/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

5/3/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Initial Status Conference Report - SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

5/17/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

5/23/2022: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER

6/1/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/2/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Initial Status Conference Order

2/17/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 02/17/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 02/17/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Civil Rights Complaint; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff); Black Lives Matter Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Shannon Thomas (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint; Order); Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReSubmission of Stipulation for Leave to Amend) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff); Black Lives Matter Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Shannon Thomas (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Liuetenant Carlos Figueroa (No. 35260) (Defendant); Captain Warner Castillo (No. 31715) (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 1; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff); Black Lives Matter Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Shannon Thomas (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff); Black Lives Matter Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Shannon Thomas (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff); Black Lives Matter Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Shannon Thomas (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Greg Akili (Plaintiff); Black Lives Matter Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Shannon Thomas (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less