This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2022 at 05:18:56 (UTC).

GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1689

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENLEAF ENGINEERING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

10966 LE CONTE AVENUE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

900 GAYLEY AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EVANSTON ROAD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFIC PROPERTY PARTNERS FORM OF BUSINESS ENTITY UNKNOWN

SCOBAR ADVENTURES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SQUAT LIKE A HEN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLTON ANDREW C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

10/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/17/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDATION

10/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF RECORDATION; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 04/10/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SQUAT LIKE A HEN, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 133.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SCOBAR ADVENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 43.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: 900 GAYLEY AVENUE ASSOCIATES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 43.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: EVANSTON ROAD, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 43.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: 10966 LE CONTE AVENUE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 43.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC PROPERTY PARTNERS, form of business entity unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost: 43.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/06/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); SQUAT LIKE A HEN, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); 10966 LE CONTE AVENUE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); SQUAT LIKE A HEN, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); 10966 LE CONTE AVENUE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); SQUAT LIKE A HEN, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); 10966 LE CONTE AVENUE, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENLEAF ENGINEERING, a California corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLTON ANDREW C