Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2020 at 22:12:51 (UTC).

GREEN & MARKER VS SURJIT RANI BAGGA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 GREEN MARKER filed an Other lawsuit against SURJIT RANI BAGGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1790

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN & MARKER

Defendants

DREAM FOURTUNE GROUP INC. DBA INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES UKNOWN BUSINESS ENTIITY

BAGGA SURJIT RANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKER RICHARD A.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COURT CLOSURES;) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COURT CLOSURES;) OF 04/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COURT CLOSURES;)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COURT CLOSURES;)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/30/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/9/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

10/9/2019: Complaint - COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • Hearing08/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 2:49 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Court Closures;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Court Closures;) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GREEN & MARKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint (in Interpleader); Filed by GREEN & MARKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GREEN & MARKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN & MARKER A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKER RICHARD A.