This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 11:05:48 (UTC).

GREEN LIVING, INC. VS CBS LOS ANGELES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 GREEN LIVING, INC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against CBS LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2673

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREEN LIVING CA

GREEN LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

GREEN LIVING INC.

Defendants

GOLDSTEIN DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

CBS TELEVISION STATIONS A DIVISION OF...

CBS LOS ANGELES

KCBS/KCAL

KCAL

GOLDSTEIN DAVID

KCBS

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

CBS TELEVISION STATIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERALD W. MOUZIS

THE MOUZIS LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

JASSY VICK CAROLAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance

7/2/2018: Notice of Continuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Notice of Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by CA GREEN LIVING (Legacy Party); GREEN LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CA GREEN LIVING (Legacy Party); GREEN LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by CBS LOS ANGELES (Defendant); KCBS (Legacy Party); CBS TELEVISION STATIONS (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by CBS LOS ANGELES (Defendant); CBS TELEVISION STATIONS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by CBS LOS ANGELES (Defendant); CBS TELEVISION STATIONS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by CBS LOS ANGELES (Defendant); KCBS (Legacy Party); CBS TELEVISION STATIONS (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CA GREEN LIVING (Legacy Party); GREEN LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CA GREEN LIVING (Legacy Party); GREEN LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by CA GREEN LIVING (Legacy Party); GREEN LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CA GREEN LIVING (Legacy Party); GREEN LIVING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less