This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 21:35:37 (UTC).

GREEN LEAF, LP VS JI YE WU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 GREEN LEAF, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JI YE WU,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD J. BURDGE JR. and GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5852

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN LEAF LP

Defendants

GOURMET WOK

WU JI YE DBA GOURMET WOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKE JEFF

HAKIMI HELGA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

6/22/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

6/23/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

6/23/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

5/27/2022: Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Judgment

5/27/2022: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/27/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER ...)

5/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ORDER ...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; O...)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; O...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT FARZAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT JI YE WU (C.C.P 585(D); CRC, RULE 3.1800)

3/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT FARZAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT JI YE WU (C.C.P 585(D); CRC, RULE 3.1800)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of the Case

3/21/2022: Statement of the Case

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFF BERKE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT JI YE WU (C.C.P 585(D); CRC, RULE 3.1800)

3/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFF BERKE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT JI YE WU (C.C.P 585(D); CRC, RULE 3.1800)

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/22/2022: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/25/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; O...)

1/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; O...)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to prosecute) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37, Gail Killefer, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (ReEntry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Entry of Default Judgment; Order ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: (ReEntry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Green Leaf, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less