This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 05:46:01 (UTC).

GREEN AID RECOVERY GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 GREEN AID RECOVERY GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9998

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREEN AID RECOVERY GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GREEN AID RECOVERY GROUP INC.

Defendants

I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLE MICHAEL C.

EARLE M.C.

LAW PHILIP C

Other Attorneys

NEER R JEFFREY

NEER R JEFFREY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE IF CAS...)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE IF CAS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)

Separate Statement

8/23/2021: Separate Statement

Case Management Statement

7/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Brief - BRIEF BRIEF RE RELATING OF CASES

7/28/2021: Brief - BRIEF BRIEF RE RELATING OF CASES

Substitution of Attorney

7/7/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/1/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Related Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 06/03/2021

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 06/03/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF R. JEFFREY NEER, ESQ., RE IMPROPER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

6/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF R. JEFFREY NEER, ESQ., RE IMPROPER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

6/11/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Answer

4/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 3:11 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 06/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by I-Chung International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Green Aid Recovery Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN AID RECOVERY GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where I-CHUNG INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEER R JEFFREY