This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 07:17:20 (UTC).

GRAPHIC RESEARCH, INC. ET. AL. VS. ACCURETTA, INC. ET.AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 GRAPHIC RESEARCH, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACCURETTA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8529

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAGHASHIA PRASHANT

Defendants

ACCURETTA INC.

VAGHASHIA GOVIND

KOMMAREDDY BRENDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANYIA ALFRED OSHIOMELE

Defendant Attorneys

ENENSTEIN DARREN SCOTT

LUDEKE BRIAN WILLIAM

PACETTI CHRIS SCOTT

RABBAT ROBERT ANTHONY

TULLY STEPHEN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

1/21/2022: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALFRED 0. ANYIA RE: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/24/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALFRED 0. ANYIA RE: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDY'S OBJECTIONS, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA'S UNTIMELY SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTI

1/25/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDY'S OBJECTIONS, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA'S UNTIMELY SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTI

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN W. LUDEKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDY'S OBJECTIONS, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA

1/25/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN W. LUDEKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDY'S OBJECTIONS, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, ACCURETTA INC.' ET AL;S OBEJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/26/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, ACCURETTA INC.' ET AL;S OBEJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

1/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

Objection - OBJECTION 4.DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDYS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ALFRED O. ANYIA FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIAS OPPOSITION TO M

1/28/2022: Objection - OBJECTION 4.DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDYS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ALFRED O. ANYIA FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIAS OPPOSITION TO M

Reply - REPLY OF DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA

1/28/2022: Reply - REPLY OF DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA

Objection - OBJECTION 2.DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIAS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION

1/28/2022: Objection - OBJECTION 2.DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF PRASHANT VAGHASHIAS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS FILED IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION

Objection - OBJECTION 3.DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDYS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA FILED IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGM

1/28/2022: Objection - OBJECTION 3.DEFENDANTS ACCURETTA, INC. AND BRENDA KOMMAREDDYS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF PRASHANT VAGHASHIA FILED IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...)

2/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/3/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...) OF 02/03/2022

2/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...) OF 02/03/2022

Notice of Ruling

2/7/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT FO...)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT FO...)

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (3rd) filed by PRASHANT VAGHASHIA on 09/16/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Prashant Vaghashia as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Prashant Vaghashia (Plaintiff); As to: Accuretta, Inc. (Defendant); Brenda Kommareddy (Defendant); Govind Vaghashia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant Accuretta, Inc. and Defendant Brenda Kommareddy against Plaintiff Prashant Vaghashia on the Amended Complaint (3rd) filed by PRASHANT VAGHASHIA on 09/16/2019 for a total of $0.00. Cost to be determined per filing of Memorandum of Costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Accuretta, Inc. (Defendant); Brenda Kommareddy (Defendant); As to: Prashant Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Brenda Kommareddy (Defendant),Accuretta, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Processing of Proposed Judgmen...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Processing of Proposed Judgment Following Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 03/04/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Processing of Proposed Judgment Following Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Filing of Proposed Judgment Fo...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDocument:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Ex Parte Application 05/31/18 at 8:30 am Melvin D. Sandvig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Contractual Fraud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Status Conference - Continued 10/16/18 at 3:00 pm Melvin D. Sandvig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GRAPHIC RESEARCH, INC. (Plaintiff); PRASHANT VAGHASHIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VAGHASHIA GOVIND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENENSTEIN DARREN SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACETTI CHRIS SCOTT