This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 15:25:56 (UTC).

GRANT A. GINN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SUSAN YVONNE UMANOFF, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 GRANT A GINN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUSAN YVONNE UMANOFF, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0317

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINN AN INDIVIDUAL GRANT A.

Defendants

UMANOFF AN INDIVIDUAL RICHARD

UMANOFF AN INDIVIDUAL SUSAN YVONNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAHOUDAI YOSI ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GRANT A. GINN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GRANT A. GINN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GRANT A. GINN, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAHOUDAI YOSI ESQ.