This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:19:04 (UTC).

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY VS RAYMOND VELASCO

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAYMOND VELASCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7279

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CALIFORNIA SHOTCRETE INC.

VELASCO RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE ELIZABETH A.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/29/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/13/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/17/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

12/4/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

8/3/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

8/3/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

SUMMONS

8/3/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RAYMOND VELASCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketANSWER-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.