This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 19:21:20 (UTC).

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ANYA NEVELEVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ANYA NEVELEVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0237

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RANCHO PACIFIC INSURANCE SERVICES

ALL INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS

NEVELEVA ANYA DBA ENCORE CIMMERCIAL INSURANCE SERVICES DBA CONCORD INSURANCE SERVICES DBA CONCORD GENERAL INSURANCE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARROW JEFFREY D.

JAMES ROBIN

FARROW JEFFREY D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SEGURA STEVE R.

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT B

CHO TERESA

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT B ESQ.

CHO TERESA ESQ.

ELRICH RINAT KLIER

SEGURA STEVE R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

9/28/2020: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

5/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREO

5/4/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREO

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES

5/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO...)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO...)

Notice of Ruling

5/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/11/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/15/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

5/4/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/5/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Jury Trial ((6 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Anya Neveleva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re: Continuance of Trial and All Related Pre-Trial Dates); Filed by Anya Neveleva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION); Filed by Anya Neveleva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Anya Neveleva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by All Insurance Underwriters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARROW JEFFREY D.