This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 08:02:08 (UTC).

GRAHAM CAMERON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ALPHA TERRACE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 GRAHAM CAMERON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALPHA TERRACE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8881

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMERON AN INDIVIDUAL GRAHAM

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY

ALPHA TERRACE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

JENKINS PROPERTIES MANAGEMETN COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GARCIA MICHAEL J.

MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.

COLEMAN JOHN MICHAEL

COLEMAN JOHN

SUBRAMANIAN MAHESH G.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

OZELLO FRANK JOSEPH

MAURER ANN M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

2/19/2020: Answer

Motion to Quash

12/23/2019: Motion to Quash

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

11/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/15/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT ALPHA TERRACE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

9/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT ALPHA TERRACE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Reply - REPLY P'S REPLY TO D'S OPP TO MTC DEPO

9/27/2019: Reply - REPLY P'S REPLY TO D'S OPP TO MTC DEPO

Request for Dismissal

6/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/31/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Cross-Complaint

5/2/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/17/2019: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COUNSEL, JOHN M. COLEMAN, IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COUNSEL, JOHN M. COLEMAN, IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

4/18/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/26/2019: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • Hearing10/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Docketat 10:28 AM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 2:41 PM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:22 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Transfer Personal Injury Case to Independent C...) of 03/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Transfer Personal Injury Case to Independent C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF GLENDALE, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by GRAHAM CAMERON, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GRAHAM CAMERON, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GRAHAM CAMERON, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GRAHAM CAMERON, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GRAHAM CAMERON, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GRAHAM CAMERON, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV08881    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

 

GRAHAM CAMERON,

                        Plaintiff(s),

            vs.

 

ALPHA TERRACE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, ET AL.,

                        Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: 19STCV08881

 

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

 

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 4, 2019

 

The Court was originally scheduled to hear this motion on 10/04/19.  The Court continued the hearing to 11/04/19 and ordered the parties to file briefs concerning any outstanding issues at least a week prior to the continued hearing date.  No party has filed a brief concerning any outstanding issues.  The Court therefore takes the motion off calendar at this time.  Plaintiff is ordered to give notice. 

 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. 

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.