This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 02:20:22 (UTC).

GRACE GRACE FITZMAURICE, ET AL. VS MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 GRACE GRACE FITZMAURICE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3430

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ LUZ

GRACE FITZMAURICE GRACE

Defendants

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

GALLARDO ANGEL

PELL CLEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAROUTUNIAN SATENIG SUSAN

ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE

HAROUTUNIAN SUSAN SUZY

SERPIK ANDREI V.

Defendant Attorneys

LEHMAN BRENT J.

LEHMAN BRENT JAY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/24/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/11/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/11/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/11/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

6/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/18/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/22/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Filing of Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Angel Gallardo and Cleve Pell/ Entry of Default if No Responsive Pleadings are Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Grace Grace Fitzmaurice (Plaintiff); Luz Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Montebello Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Montebello Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Grace Grace Fitzmaurice (Plaintiff); Luz Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Grace Grace Fitzmaurice (Plaintiff); Luz Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Grace Grace Fitzmaurice (Plaintiff); Luz Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Grace Grace Fitzmaurice (Plaintiff); Luz Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Grace Grace Fitzmaurice (Plaintiff); Luz Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAROUTUNIAN SATENIG SUSAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERPIK ANDREI V.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE