This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 08:14:05 (UTC).

GRACE BAIN VS LYFT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 GRACE BAIN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1446

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAIN GRACE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LYFT INC.

AMIRKHANYAN ARTUR

ARSAN ARMAN

NAZARET NINASYAN

Defendant and Cross Defendant

ARSAN ARMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMIESON STEPHEN ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

BRAUN JEFF

CASEY DEMIAN MICHAEL

NEILL BRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BAIN'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM

1/21/2020: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF BAIN'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; ORDER) OF 09/04/2019

9/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; ORDER) OF 09/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; ORDER) OF 09/04/2019

9/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; ORDER) OF 09/04/2019

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/10/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial

6/19/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/19/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

6/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 06/10/2019

6/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 06/10/2019

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

5/28/2019: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

5/28/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/28/2019: Answer

Answer

5/30/2019: Answer

Notice of Related Case

5/22/2019: Notice of Related Case

Answer

5/15/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case

5/13/2019: Notice of Related Case

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LYFT, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketResponse (to Plaintiff Bain's Informal Discovery Conference Form); Filed by LYFT, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:36 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation to Consolidate Cases; Order) of 09/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order re Stipulation to Consolidate Cases; Order) of 09/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LYFT, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ninasyan Nazaret (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Ninasyan Nazaret (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Grace Bain (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMIESON STEPHEN ALLEN