Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2019 at 00:52:22 (UTC).

GPI 500 BRAND, LTD., A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS ROYAL CREDIT INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 GPI 500 BRAND, LTD , A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ROYAL CREDIT INDUSTRIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9409

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GPI 500 BRAND LTD. A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GPI 500 BRAND LTD.

Defendants

LOAN GALLERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROYAL CREDIT INDUSTRIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROYAL CREDIT INDUSTRIES INC.

LOAN GALLERY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN DAVID MARC

Defendant Attorneys

KAZANDJIAN YEZNIK OHANNES

KAZANDJIAN YEZNIK O.

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

6/12/2019: Writ - Return

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

4/29/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - POSSESSION

4/30/2019: Writ of Execution - POSSESSION

Stipulation for Judgment

4/29/2019: Stipulation for Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

4/29/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

4/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Request for Judicial Notice

4/9/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/9/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DENY DEMURRER AND MOTION T...)

4/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DENY DEMURRER AND MOTION T...)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/2/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/20/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ROYAL CREDIT INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

3/21/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ROYAL CREDIT INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/21/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 9:30 PM in Department 56; Non-Jury Trial (reUnlawfull) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketPossession; Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketJudgment (pursuant to stipulation); Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Loan Gallery Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Loan Gallery Inc., a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Royal Credit Industries, Inc., a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GPI 500 Brand, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN DAVID MARC