This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2019 at 03:47:19 (UTC).

GOVIND VAGHASHIA ET AL VS PRASHANT VAGHASHIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 GOVIND VAGHASHIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PRASHANT VAGHASHIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4685

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VAGHASHIA GOVIND

VAGHASHIA SONAL

PRASHANT/MITA/GOVIND/SONAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VAGHASHIA MITA P.

VAGHASHIA PRASHANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENENSTEIN DARREN S.

Defendant Attorney

HORN VALERIE F.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HORN STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

3/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

1/22/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

1/22/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

1/22/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

1/22/2019: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

1/22/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - Declaration of Mark Liphardt

1/22/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Mark Liphardt

Declaration - Declaration of Mark Liphardt

1/22/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Mark Liphardt

Separate Statement

1/22/2019: Separate Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

1/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/25/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/5/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/14/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Service of Summons

10/15/2018: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Service of Summons

Minute Order -

9/26/2018: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/14/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL); Filed by Prashant Vaghashia (Defendant); Mita P. Vaghashia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff); Sonal Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff); Sonal Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY (CODE CIV. PROC. 872.230)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Govind Vaghashia (Plaintiff); Sonal Vaghashia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VAGHASHIA GOVIND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENENSTEIN DARREN SCOTT