This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 03:26:34 (UTC).

GORDON, LAWRENCE VS LUCIEN, EBONY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 GORDON, LAWRENCE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against LUCIEN, EBONY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1177

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GORDON LAWRENCE

Respondent

LUCIEN EBONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEVONNE SADARA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Civil Harassment

3/10/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied.

3/10/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Denied.

Proof of Service

3/25/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

4/1/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/1/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service - - PERSONAL - CH-109 - CH-100 - CH-120 - CH-120 INFO - OTHER: ATTACHMENT (1)

4/14/2021: Proof of Service - - PERSONAL - CH-109 - CH-100 - CH-120 - CH-120 INFO - OTHER: ATTACHMENT (1)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (- PERSONAL - CH-109 - CH-100 - CH-120 - CH-120 INFO - OTHER: ATTACHMENT (1) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied. ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVONNE SADARA