This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 15:12:12 (UTC).

GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL, , ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL, , filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3699

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENGRY BARBARA RACHAEL

GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL AS TRUSTEE OF THE GNK TRUST

KIMBALL CHARLES NEWTON

KIMBALL GORDON EUGENE

KIMBALL KATHLEEN MARIE

KIMBALL MARGARET J.

KIMBALL NANCY BENGRY

MARGARET J. KIMBALL AS TRUSTEE OF THE MARGARET J. KIMBALL SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST

NANCY BENGRY KIMBALL AS TRUSTEE OF THE GNK TRUST

KIMBALL RANCHES - EL HOGAR

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTSON ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/18/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Amended Complaint

5/10/2023: Amended Complaint

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/9/2023: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE FOR GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL

5/9/2023: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE FOR GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL

Motion for Trial Preference - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE FOR GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL

5/8/2023: Motion for Trial Preference - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE FOR GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE FOR GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL

5/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE FOR GORDON EUGENE KIMBALL

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/10/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/30/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/29/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/24/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

3/15/2023: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

3/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketNotice Of Entry Of Order Re: Joint Stipulation Allowing Plaintiffs To File First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Robertson, IV in Support of Motion for Trial Preference for Gordon Eugene Kimball: Name Extension changed from of Alexander Robertson, Iv in Support of Motion for Trial Preference for Gordon Eugene Kimball to of Alexander Robertson, IV in Support of Motion for Trial Preference for Gordon Eugene Kimball ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff); Gordon Eugene Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball, (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball, (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball as trustee of the Margaret J. Kimball Separate Property Trust (Plaintiff); Charles Newton Kimball, (Plaintiff); Kathleen Marie Kimball, (Plaintiff); Barbara Rachael Bengry, (Plaintiff); Kimball Ranches - El Hogar (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration of Alexander Robertson, Iv in Support of Motion for Trial Preference for Gordon Eugene Kimball; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketJoint Stipulation Allowing Plaintiffs To File First Amended Complaint; [Proposed] Order; Signed and Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Stipulation Allowing Plaintiffs To File First Amended Complaint; [Proposed] Order: Filed By: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion for Trial Preference for Gordon Eugene Kimball; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff); As to: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Alexander Robertson, IV in Support of Motion for Trial Preference for Gordon Eugene Kimball; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Alexander Robertson (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff); Gordon Eugene Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball, (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball, (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball as trustee of the Margaret J. Kimball Separate Property Trust (Plaintiff); Charles Newton Kimball, (Plaintiff); Kathleen Marie Kimball, (Plaintiff); Barbara Rachael Bengry, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff); Gordon Eugene Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball, (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball, (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball as trustee of the Margaret J. Kimball Separate Property Trust (Plaintiff); Charles Newton Kimball, (Plaintiff); Kathleen Marie Kimball, (Plaintiff); Barbara Rachael Bengry, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gordon Eugene Kimball, (Plaintiff); Gordon Eugene Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball, (Plaintiff); Nancy Bengry Kimball as trustee of the GNK Trust (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball, (Plaintiff); Margaret J. Kimball as trustee of the Margaret J. Kimball Separate Property Trust (Plaintiff); Charles Newton Kimball, (Plaintiff); Kathleen Marie Kimball, (Plaintiff); Barbara Rachael Bengry, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less