Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:29:19 (UTC).

GORDON DONLOU VS A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 GORDON DONLOU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE, ROBERT B. BROADBELT and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2230

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONLOU GORDON

GORDON DONLOU AS TRUSTEE OF THE GORDON

Defendants

DOES 1-25

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREDWAY LUMSDAINE & DOYLE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SHERRY ANNE LEAR

LEAR SHERRY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Summons

8/1/2017: Summons

Complaint

8/1/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

8/3/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/15/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Unknown

9/15/2017: Unknown

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

10/19/2017: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Unknown

10/19/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

10/23/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

10/30/2017: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

11/28/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/5/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

12/12/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/22/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Assignment

8/22/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Notice of Settlement

11/13/2018: Notice of Settlement

Notice

12/31/2018: Notice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/13/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (as to Entire Action); Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice (Of Court's Case Reassignment); Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-10-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Summons; Filed by GORDON DONLOU, as Trustee of the Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WEST LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEAR SHERRY ANNE